Global patent index - EP 0708491 B1

EP 0708491 B1 2000-01-26 - Optical control system for an antenna with electronic scanning

Title (en)

Optical control system for an antenna with electronic scanning

Title (de)

Optisches Steuerungssystem für eine Antenne mit elektronischer Ablenkung

Title (fr)

Système de commande optique d'antenne à balayage électronique

Publication

EP 0708491 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95402134 A

Priority

FR 9411498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0708491A1] The system includes two light sources (T1,T2) which transmit orthogonal polarisation light beams (F1,F2) through a delay mechanism (DCR). A delay (DCRn) is created for each of the phase shifter elements. A mirror separator (MD1-MDn) separates out the two light polarisations. One set is detected (PDR1,1-n) and the phase shift operates the transmitter (ED1-EDn). The other polarisation delay set passes to a receiver detection circuit (FFC) which operates the receiver phase shifters.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 3/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/2676 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0708491 A1 19960424; EP 0708491 B1 20000126; DE 69514752 D1 20000302; DE 69514752 T2 20000831; FR 2725076 A1 19960329; FR 2725076 B1 19961213

INPADOC legal status

2006-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050922

2006-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2005-09-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050922

2005-09-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050922

2004-09-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040922

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040916

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-04-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69514752

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-02

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1999-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990507

1996-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960610

1996-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT