Global patent index - EP 0708508 B1

EP 0708508 B1 2000-02-09 - Process and device for equipping connector housings

Title (en)

Process and device for equipping connector housings

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Bestücken von Steckergehäusen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour équiper des boîtiers de connecteurs

Publication

EP 0708508 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94810669 A

Priority

CH 317094 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0708508A1] The automatic wiring system has the plug housings (1) fed one after the other along a transport path, with transfer to the wiring point via at least two synchronised grippers (19,20) for wiring at least one conductor to each plug housing so that it cooperates with a corresponding plug contact. The grippers are spaced apart in the transport direction of the plug housings and operated in alternation for synchronised transfer of two successive plug housings to and from the wiring point for increasing the overall prodn. rate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 43/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/00 (2006.01); H01R 43/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/20 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49181 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49185 (2013.01); Y10T 29/5193 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53213 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53239 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0708508 A1 19960424; EP 0708508 B1 20000209; CH 689288 A5 19990129; DE 59409144 D1 20000316; JP 3478915 B2 20031215; JP H08236243 A 19960913; US 5761796 A 19980609

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-09-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59409144

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111124

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101126

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091124

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20091124

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081117

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081113

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: UFFICIO TECNICO ING. A. MANNUCCI

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000323

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59409144

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-16

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-07-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOMAX HOLDING AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990324

1996-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960823

1996-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT