Global patent index - EP 0708607 B1

EP 0708607 B1 2000-06-07 - UNI-DIRECTIONALLY SIZABLE BRACELET ASSEMBLY AND CLOSURE MEANS THEREFOR

Title (en)

UNI-DIRECTIONALLY SIZABLE BRACELET ASSEMBLY AND CLOSURE MEANS THEREFOR

Title (de)

IN EINER RICHTUNG EINSTELLBARES ARMBAND UND VERSCHLUSSMITTEL

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE BRACELET AJUSTABLE EN UNE DIRECTION ET MOYEN DE FERMETURE ASSOCIE

Publication

EP 0708607 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94922528 A

Priority

  • US 9407796 W
  • US 9126093 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9502343A1] A closure means (10) for an identification band or bracelet (20) includes integrally formed unidirectional engagement means (40). The closure means includes a body portion (12) that is attached to a first end of the bracelet (22), and an opening to receive the second end of the bracelet (24). The body portion (12) is preferably configured as a sleeve having a rectangular cross section, with one or more deformable mounting posts (32) configured to be placed through a corresponding one or more mating openings (26) in the first end of the bracelet and thereafter deformed to retain the first end of the bracelet on the body portion. Also, the engagement means (40) includes one or more protruding teeth (42) having biting extremities (44) adjacent the opening on the body portion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 5/00; A44C 5/20; A61B 5/117; G09F 3/00; G09F 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/00 (2006.01); A44C 5/20 (2006.01); A61B 5/117 (2006.01); G09F 3/00 (2006.01); G09F 3/14 (2006.01); G09F 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/005 (2013.01); A44C 5/2076 (2013.01); Y10T 24/1498 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9502343 A1 19950126; AU 679547 B2 19970703; AU 7360094 A 19950213; DE 69424870 D1 20000713; DE 69424870 T2 20001019; EP 0708607 A1 19960501; EP 0708607 A4 19960626; EP 0708607 B1 20000607; ES 2148337 T3 20001016; JP H09500301 A 19970114; US 5479797 A 19960102

INPADOC legal status

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100711

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100711

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100711

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090723

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090720

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090716

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060712

2007-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060712

2007-04-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20070201

2007-03-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2007-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2006-07-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060712

2005-07-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050719

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-07-14 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050714

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-07-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050714

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2148337

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: UFFICIO BREVETTI RICCARDI & C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69424870

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-13

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1998-12-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981113

1996-06-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 19960508

1996-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1996-05-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960119

1996-05-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE