Global Patent Index - EP 0709048 B1

EP 0709048 B1 2000-01-26 - Built-in footrest mechanism in combination with a chair

Title (en)

Built-in footrest mechanism in combination with a chair

Title (de)

Fusstützenmechanismus in Kombination mit einem Stuhl

Title (fr)

Mécanisme d'un repose-pieds en combinaison avec une chaise

Publication

EP 0709048 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95202728 A

Priority

  • BE 9400974 A
  • BE 9500279 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0709048A1] Built-in footrest mechanism in a chair (1) with a support (8) which can be moved between a folded-in position in which it is situated under de seat (3) and a position in which it is situated in front of the seat (3), characterized in that it contains a frame (6) which is mounted under the seat (3) in the chair (1); an auxiliary frame (7) which is telescopic in relation to this frame (3) upon which the support (8) is mounted adjustable in height; and a common drive (9) for sliding the above-mentioned auxiliary frame in and out (7) and for adjusting the support (8) in height in relation to this auxiliary frame (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 7/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/506 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0709048 A1 19960501; EP 0709048 B1 20000126; DE 69514754 D1 20000302

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SANTERMANS GASTON

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-05-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20001010

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-06 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20001106

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20001031

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-10-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001010

2000-10-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001010

2000-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-06-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-04-27 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000427

2000-04-26 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69514754 20000302

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL

2000-01-26 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-01-26 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-01-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-01-26 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000126

1999-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981123

1997-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961104

1996-05-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL