Global Patent Index - EP 0709332 B1

EP 0709332 B1 2000-12-13 - ELEVATOR GROUP CONTROL SYSTEM

Title (en)

ELEVATOR GROUP CONTROL SYSTEM

Title (de)

GRUPPENSTEUERUNG FÜR AUFZÜGE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE COMMANDE D'UN GROUPE D'ASCENSEURS

Publication

EP 0709332 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94914629 A

Priority

JP 9400795 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9531393A1] A system for group controlling a plurality of elevators in accordance with group control algorithm including a plurality of parameters. This system includes a means for searching an optimum set. An optimum set means an optimum combination among combinations of parameters to be given to the group control algorithm. A new set is generated by crossing-over or mutation. Superior sets are accumulated in a storage by utilizing the additional registration of excellent sets in a storage and the deletion poor sets therefrom. An optimum set is selected from these superior sets. Therefore, the searching of an optimum set can be done efficiently.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 1/18; G06F 15/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/18 (2006.01); B66B 1/20 (2006.01); B66B 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/2458 (2013.01); B66B 2201/102 (2013.01); B66B 2201/211 (2013.01); B66B 2201/212 (2013.01); B66B 2201/216 (2013.01); B66B 2201/222 (2013.01); B66B 2201/401 (2013.01); B66B 2201/403 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9531393 A1 19951123; DE 69426420 D1 20010118; DE 69426420 T2 20010503; EP 0709332 A1 19960501; EP 0709332 A4 19960313; EP 0709332 B1 20001213; JP 3215426 B2 20011009; KR 0178322 B1 19990415

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080514

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080527

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080522

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA

- Free text: MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA#2-3, MARUNOUCHI 2-CHOME#CHIYODA-KU TOKYO-TO, 100 (JP) -TRANSFER TO- MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA#2-3, MARUNOUCHI 2-CHOME#CHIYODA-KU TOKYO-TO, 100 (JP)

2001-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69426420 20010118

2000-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

1998-10-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980820

1996-05-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950728

1996-05-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

1996-03-13 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

1996-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI