Global Patent Index - EP 0709513 B1

EP 0709513 B1 2000-03-08 - Washing and/or drying machines, incorporating a light

Title (en)

Washing and/or drying machines, incorporating a light

Title (de)

Maschinen zum Waschen und/oder zum Trocknen mit einer Beleuchtung

Title (fr)

Machines à laver et/ou à sécher incorporant un éclairage

Publication

EP 0709513 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95116269 A

Priority

IT TO940858 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0709513A1] A washing and/or drying machine is described, such as a laundry washing machine or a dishwashing machine, comprising all the known elements for its functioning, from among which: an electric control and actuation circuit (30) comprising a plurality of agent devices, for executing the functions for which the machine is proposed (washing and/or drying of laundry or dishes), and one or more command means (5-8) for the manual selection of the modes of use the machine, a main power switch (9) for enabling/disabling the power supply to said electric control and actuation circuit (30), a light (23). The main characteristic of the described washing and/or drying machine is that the light (23) is connected to the electrical mains (L,N) before the main power switch (9), so as that it can be electrically supplied independently from the state of said main power switch (9) and that the electrical supply of the light (23) is enabled by way of switching means (25-27) activated by way of at least a first (5) of said command means (5-8), said first command means (5) being mainly produced for the selecting of other modes of use of the machine. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/005 (2013.01); H01H 2003/085 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0709513 A1 19960501; EP 0709513 B1 20000308; DE 69515414 D1 20000413; DE 69515414 T2 20001026; ES 2144557 T3 20000616; IT 1268140 B1 19970220; IT TO940858 A1 19960426; IT TO940858 D0 19941026

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071017

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2009-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20071017

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071016

2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061013

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20071016

2006-11-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061107

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-10-06 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061006

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-09-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060925

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2144557

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69515414

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-13

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

1999-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990324

1997-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961104

1996-05-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB