Global Patent Index - EP 0709516 B1

EP 0709516 B1 2000-02-09 - Monitoring device for the cleaning of the condenser of a drier

Title (en)

Monitoring device for the cleaning of the condenser of a drier

Title (de)

Überwachungsvorrichtung für die Reinigung des Kondensators eines Trockners

Title (fr)

Dispositif de signalisation pour le nettoyage d'un condenseur de sèche-linge

Publication

EP 0709516 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95402344 A

Priority

FR 9412809 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0709516A1] A signal system for a laundry condenser drying has at least one mechanical memory (1), a non-volatile electronic memory (2) with an incremental unit (3) and an alarm (3, 5). The incremental unit (3) acts with the electronic memory (2) on each drying cycle while the mechanical memory (1) has not stored the removal and replacement of the condenser in the dryer. The electronic memory (2) is restarted on each replacement of the condenser. The alarm system signals the drying of the condenser when the electronic memory has achieved a set count. The electronic memory (2) is an EEPROM, and the set count of cycles is pref. 30.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 58/24; D06F 58/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 58/22 (2006.01); D06F 58/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 58/22 (2013.01); D06F 58/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0709516 A1 19960501; EP 0709516 B1 20000209; DE 69514984 D1 20000316; DE 69514984 T2 20000706; ES 2143023 T3 20000501; FR 2726298 A1 19960503; FR 2726298 B1 19961129

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051020

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20021113

2003-08-15 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-06-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011020

2002-06-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011021

2001-10-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011021

2001-10-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011020

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20001026

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-10-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20001024

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-10-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001009

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-09-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20000921

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-09-18 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20000918

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-08-11 [EN4] FR: NOTIFICATION OF NON FILING TRANSLATION IN AN EARLIER BOPI IS ERRONEOUS

2000-07-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-07 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000509

2000-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143023 T3

2000-04-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69514984 20000316

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990315

1996-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961022

1996-05-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE