Global patent index - EP 0709577 B1

EP 0709577 B1 2000-06-07 - A valve having four connection ports and two positions

Title (en)

A valve having four connection ports and two positions

Title (de)

Ventil mit vier Verbindungsöffnungen und zwei Stellungen

Title (fr)

Valve à quatre orifices de raccordement et deux positions

Publication

EP 0709577 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95440070 A

Priority

FR 9413107 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0709577A1] The valve (1) has four coupling ports (A,B,C,D) of which the first and second (A,B) are designed to connect directly or indirectly to a fluid feed source (2), while the third and fourth (C,D) are designed to connect directly or indirectly with an actuator (3). The valve incorporates a distributor (4) with four ports (A',B',C',D'), of which the first, second and fourth are connected to the corresponding ports of the valve, and two separate positions (5,6) governed by a control member (13). In the first position (5) a first non-return valve (9) allows fluid to flow from the first port (A') to the third port (C'), while the second and fourth ports (B',D') are in direct communication, and in the second position (6) the third and fourth ports (C',D') are in direct communication, and a second non-return valve (12) allows fluid to circulate from the third and fourth ports (C',D') towards the third one. A third non-return valve (15) allows fluid to circulate only between the second port (B') of the distributor and the corresponding port (B) of the valve.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 11/024

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/042 (2006.01); F15B 11/024 (2006.01); F16K 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 11/024 (2013.01); F15B 2211/30505 (2013.01); F15B 2211/30525 (2013.01); F15B 2211/3127 (2013.01); F15B 2211/31576 (2013.01); F15B 2211/329 (2013.01); F15B 2211/7054 (2013.01); Y10T 137/2554 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0709577 A1 19960501; EP 0709577 B1 20000607; DE 69517386 D1 20000713; DE 69517386 T2 20001228; FR 2726343 A1 19960503; FR 2726343 B1 19970124; JP H08210308 A 19960820; US 5749390 A 19980512

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091026

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081028

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081016

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081030

- Year of fee payment: 14

2001-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-06 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-09-07 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000907

2000-08-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69517386

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-13

2000-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

2000-06-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000607

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990804

1996-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961021

1996-05-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI