Global Patent Index - EP 0709619 B1

EP 0709619 B1 2000-05-10 - Vehicle headlight with a complex-surface reflector

Title (en)

Vehicle headlight with a complex-surface reflector

Title (de)

Kfz-Scheinwerfer mit Mehrflächen-Reflektor

Title (fr)

Projecteur pour véhicule avec un réflecteur comportant plusieurs secteurs

Publication

EP 0709619 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95116738 A

Priority

GB 9421697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0709619A1] A headlight including a light source (3) and a reflector (5), and wherein the reflector (5) collects the source-emitted light over 360 DEG about the source (3) to emit a beam concentrated entirely below the cutoff line (2). The reflector (5) presents a complex reflecting surface including four sectors (10,11,12,13), a first pair (10,11) of which is located on one side of the optical axis (4), and a second pair (12,13) of which is located on the opposite side. The surfaces of the sectors in each pair are connected continuously to each other at respective half planes (A,B) extending through the optical axis (4) and arranged according to the cutoff line (2), form a respective branch of an ellipse (20,21) at each half plane (A,B), and are defined over at least 75% of their angular extension by the envelope of arcs (33,34,35,36) having centers (C1,C2,C3,C4) offset on either side of the optical axis (4). The source (3) is defined by a filament centered on the optical axis (4) but off-centered axially in relation to a first focal point (F) common to the ellipse branches (20,21). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 7/08; F21V 7/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1364 (2013.01); F21S 48/137 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0709619 A1 19960501; EP 0709619 B1 20000510; DE 69516798 D1 20000615; DE 69516798 T2 20001109; ES 2148401 T3 20001016; GB 2294536 A 19960501; GB 2294536 B 19980617; GB 9421697 D0 19941214

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051024

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-08-15 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030501

2002-10-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021025

2002-10-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021025

2001-12-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011205

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20011031

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-10-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011009

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-10-09 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20011009

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148401 T3

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516798 20000615

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE

2000-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21V 7/08 A, 7F 21V 7/09 B

1999-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990305

1997-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961031

1996-05-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE