Global Patent Index - EP 0709725 B1

EP 0709725 B1 2000-12-13 - Silver halide photographic emulsions with reduced dye desensitisation

Title (en)

Silver halide photographic emulsions with reduced dye desensitisation

Title (de)

Photographische Silberhalogenidemulsionen mit verminderter Farbdesensibilisierung

Title (fr)

Emulsions photographiques aux halogénures d'argent ayant une désensibilisation par le colorant réduite

Publication

EP 0709725 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95420278 A

Priority

FR 9413050 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0709725A1] The present invention concerns a silver halide emulsion, and more particularly a silver halide emulsion which resolves the problem of desensitisation which can be caused by the spectral sensitising dye. This emulsion is an emulsion of the core/shell type having a particular grain structure which has been chemically sensitised by means of thiourea compounds and a gold (I) compound which does not contain a labile sulphur atom. The emulsions of the present invention make it possible to reduce the dye desensitisation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/09; G03C 1/035

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/035 (2006.01); G03C 1/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/09 (2013.01); G03C 1/035 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0709725 A1 19960501; EP 0709725 B1 20001213; DE 69519621 D1 20010118; DE 69519621 T2 20010613; FR 2726376 A1 19960503; FR 2726376 B1 19981016

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-15 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-04 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021013

2003-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030501

2002-10-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021013

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011030

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-10-05 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011005

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-09-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010914

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-05-23 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY

2001-04-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69519621 20010118

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KODAK-PATHE

2000-06-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY

2000-06-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000228

1996-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961025

1996-05-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB