Global Patent Index - EP 0709867 B1

EP 0709867 B1 2001-12-05 - Electric vacuum interrupter

Title (en)

Electric vacuum interrupter

Title (de)

Elektrischer Vakuumschalter

Title (fr)

Interrupteur électrique sous vide

Publication

EP 0709867 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95116884 A

Priority

FR 9413408 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0709867A1] The circuit breaker (I) includes an upper static disc (4) and a lower moving disc (5) which are mounted in the upper part of a sealed vacuum unit (1). The lower part of the unit contains the command push rod mechanism. The outside of the unit around the disc circuit breakers has a coil activator (2). The coil has two extension pieces (2a,2b) which curve round to connect to an extension (8) from the upper disc. The extension pieces are separated by a gap, which has a magnetic circuit (7) inserted. When the circuit breaker operates part of the arcing current passes through this extension section, reducing arcing problems.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/66; H01H 33/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/66 (2006.01); H01H 33/664 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/6641 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0709867 A1 19960501; EP 0709867 B1 20011205; CN 1075663 C 20011128; CN 1130797 A 19960911; DE 69524363 D1 20020117; DE 69524363 T2 20020814; ES 2167397 T3 20020516; FR 2726396 A1 19960503; FR 2726396 B1 19961213; JP H08212881 A 19960820; US 5861597 A 19990119

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-07-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130628

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111017

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091027

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110309

2011-03-22 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110310

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091026

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081022

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081121

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081009

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-10-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051026

2004-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040501

2004-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2003-01-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2003-01-10 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-11-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2002-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20021031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-08-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2002-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2167397 T3

2002-02-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020129

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69524363 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOLONGEAT-MOBLEU, ROGER, SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC

2001-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BURNAZ, FREDERIC, SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC

2001-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHELLEKENS, HANS, SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC

2000-03-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SA

1999-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991116

1999-09-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SA

1996-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961026

1996-05-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL