Global patent index - EP 0709914 B1

EP 0709914 B1 2000-01-12 - RF seeker head antenna system for missiles

Title (en)

RF seeker head antenna system for missiles

Title (de)

HF-Suchkopf-Antennensystem für Flugkörper

Title (fr)

Système d'antenne d'une tête chercheuse-HF pour missiles

Publication

EP 0709914 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95116740 A

Priority

DE 4438089 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0709914A1] The search heads are part of an hf antenna system disposed on an e.g. dielectric carrier plate. The antenna system is composed of a group of four logarithmic-periodic cross-dipole antennas. The dipole axes are inclined towards each other in the radiating direction. Sum and difference diagrams are obtained using a monopole supply network in azimuth and elevation. The phase centres of the active cross-dipoles are separated by a maximum of 0.7<*>lambda. The system may also include optronic or millimetre wave sensors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 11/10; H01Q 1/28; H01Q 25/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/28 (2006.01); H01Q 11/10 (2006.01); H01Q 25/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/281 (2013.01); H01Q 11/105 (2013.01); H01Q 25/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0709914 A1 19960501; EP 0709914 B1 20000112; US 5686929 A 19971111

INPADOC legal status

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111024

2012-08-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59507604

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120629

2012-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111024

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101021

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101022

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101104

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-04-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2006-04-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2006-04-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000512

2000-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59507604

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000217

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: BODENSEEWERK GERAETETECHNIK GMBH

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990209

1998-11-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: BODENSEEWERK GERAETETECHNIK GMBH

1998-11-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1996-07-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960520

1996-05-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB