Global Patent Index - EP 0710173 B1

EP 0710173 B1 2000-01-12 - TRANSPORT APPARATUS FOR CUTTING DEVICE

Title (en)

TRANSPORT APPARATUS FOR CUTTING DEVICE

Title (de)

ZUFÜHRVORRICHTUNG FÜR SCHNEIDVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT POUR APPAREIL DE COUPE

Publication

EP 0710173 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94922590 A

Priority

  • US 9408028 W
  • US 9264193 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9502488A1] Apparatus for trimming small booklet-like products transported by a mechanism (16) between a position serving for front trimming and a position serving for foot and head trimming. The mechanism (16) comprises a pair of transport bands (18, 20) guided about a deflection roll (24) at their ends facing the insertion region (22). A synchronously-drivable auxiliary transport band (26') extends beyond the main transport bands (18, 20) towards the insertion region (22) and is guided about an auxiliary deflection roll (28') at its end facing the insertion region (22). A link (118) extends between the auxiliary deflection roll (28') and a second small roll which is vertically adjustable by an adjusting mechanism (108).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/06; B26D 1/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/14 (2006.01); B26D 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/0625 (2013.01); B26D 7/0675 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9502488 A1 19950126; CA 2167057 A1 19950126; CA 2167057 C 20040706; DE 69422626 D1 20000217; DE 69422626 T2 20000621; EP 0710173 A1 19960508; EP 0710173 A4 19960724; EP 0710173 B1 20000112; JP H09500063 A 19970107

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130718

2014-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69422626

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130718

2014-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-12-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69422626

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120809

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110714

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-08-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG;ELESTASTRASSE 8;7310 BAD RAGAZ (CH)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69422626 20000217

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI

1998-05-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980415

1996-08-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KINSON, ROBERT, D., JR.

1996-07-24 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19960604

1996-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI

1996-05-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960126

1996-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI