Global Patent Index - EP 0710272 B1

EP 0710272 B1 2000-03-22 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SOFTENING DISPERSIONS

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SOFTENING DISPERSIONS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON WEICHSPÜLER-DISPERSIONEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE DISPERSIONS ASSOUPLISSANTES

Publication

EP 0710272 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94923726 A

Priority

  • DE 4324395 A
  • EP 9402283 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9503384A1] It has been discovered that aqueous dispersions of cationic textile softening compounds of the type of the quaternary ammonium compounds have a particularly stable viscosity when the rheological data correspond to the formula lg y = - k . lg tan o + A, in which y stands for the viscosity and tan o for the ratio (G"/G') between the loss module G" and the storage module G'. A process is thus disclosed for producing aqueous textile softener dispersions with a stable viscosity set in the range given by the formula by known influencing quantities, for example the intensity and the duration of the shearing process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/00; C11D 1/62; C11D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/62 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); D06M 13/463 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/62 (2013.01); C11D 3/0015 (2013.01); D06M 13/463 (2013.01); D06M 2200/50 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 4324395 A1 19950126; AT 190999 T 20000415; EP 0710272 A1 19960508; EP 0710272 B1 20000322; ES 2145831 T3 20000716; WO 9503384 A1 19950202

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070712

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070713

2008-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070713

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070712

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Effective date: 20070731

2006-09-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060912

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-08-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060825

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-07-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060719

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-07-13 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060713

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-07-12 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060712

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-07-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060706

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-07-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060703

- Year of fee payment: 13

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145831 T3

2000-06-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409239 20000427

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

2000-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190999 T 20000415

1996-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960502

1996-05-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960115

1996-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL