Global Patent Index - EP 0710405 B1

EP 0710405 B1 2001-03-07 - ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR, ESPECIALLY FOR MOTOR VEHICLES

Title (en)

ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR, ESPECIALLY FOR MOTOR VEHICLES

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHER VERBINDER, INSBESONDERE FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE CONNEXION ELECTRIQUE, NOTAMMENT POUR VEHICULES A MOTEUR

Publication

EP 0710405 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95917901 A

Priority

  • DE 9500630 W
  • DE 4418004 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4418004A1] The electrical connector consists of a plug and a socket part. The socket part comprises an aperture to take the insert section of the plug part in which there is at least one contact pin. When a connection is made, the pin enters the socket axially and contacts a sleeve. The plug part comprises a housing with at least one tubular channel for the contact sleeve and an end plate with at least one insertion hole for the pin of the socket part. Said end plate can be moved between two axial positions in relation to the housing by means of longitudinal guides between a withdrawal and an insertion position. In the withdrawal position the contact sleeve can be axially fitted in the housing until a sprung tongue formed on the housing engages behind a shoulder in the contact sleeve once it is in a given fitting position. In the insertion position a longitudinal guide on the end plate enters the spring path of the tongue and holds the contact sleeve in its fitted position. To ensure easy and reliable construction of the plug part it is proposed that the end plate be formed by the crown of a U-shaped cap, the sides of which are longitudinally guided on the outer contour of the housing. The tubular wall of the housing is thus longitudinally split in one section and forms an outwardly sprung tongue between two gaps. Said tongue extends in the longitudinal guide section of the side-wall of the cap on the housing. The spring path of the tongue is directed outwardly over the outer contour of the housing. In the withdrawal position of the cap the cap side-wall facing the tongue releases the tongue's spring path but covers it at least partially in the insertion position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/436

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/436 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/4364 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 4418004 A1 19951123; DE 4418004 C2 19980806; EP 0710405 A1 19960508; EP 0710405 B1 20010307; ES 2154730 T3 20010416; US 5730625 A 19980324; WO 9532531 A1 19951130

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100512

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110131

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090511

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090515

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090522

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050513

2006-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-05-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050513

2005-05-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050512

2004-05-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040528

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-04-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040427

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-02-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2154730

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59509073

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-12

2001-04-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010320

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990216

1999-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990216

1997-04-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DELPHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1996-05-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960119

1996-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT