Global Patent Index - EP 0710557 B1

EP 0710557 B1 2000-05-10 - Device and method for controlled transfer of ink

Title (en)

Device and method for controlled transfer of ink

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur kontrollierten Übertragung von Druckfarbe

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour un transfert d'encre contrôlé

Publication

EP 0710557 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95115881 A

Priority

DE 4436102 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0710557A1] The device contains an ink raising roller (1) reciprocally movable between an ink ductor (6) and a first ink roller (7) by a pivoting mechanism (2,3) with a discontinuous drive independently of the main drive of the printing machine. The drive is a linear drive, pref. a linear motor or a piezoactuator. The phase relationship between the ink raising roller and a plate cylinder, the number of ink raising cards per machine revolution and the dwell time on the colour ductor and on the first ink roller can be individually adjusted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 4436102 A1 19960411; DE 4436102 C2 20000105; EP 0710557 A1 19960508; EP 0710557 B1 20000510; JP 3834082 B2 20061018; JP H08224859 A 19960903

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081103

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-10-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2005-10-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051009

2004-10-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041020

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-10-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031009

2002-09-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020924

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000714

2000-07-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508309 20000615

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970917

1996-05-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951009

1996-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT