Global Patent Index - EP 0710619 B1

EP 0710619 B1 2000-04-12 - Procedure and device for monitoring and/or controlling the speed of an electric drive with frequency converter for lifting gears

Title (en)

Procedure and device for monitoring and/or controlling the speed of an electric drive with frequency converter for lifting gears

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zum Überwachen und/oder Steuern der Drehzahl eines Elektroantriebs mit Frequenzumrichter für Hubwerke

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la surveillance et/ou la commande de la vitesse de rotation d'une commande électrique avec convertisseur de fréquence pour dispositifs de levage

Publication

EP 0710619 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95250263 A

Priority

DE 4440420 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0710619A2] The rev control system uses a rev control device (9) connected to the frequency converter (13) for supplying the asynchronous winch motor (1), a safety brake (11) for the latter and a rev counter (6) indicating the actual motor revs, for maintaining the max torque delivered by the motor to a value which is less the braking torque of the braking device. Pref. the rev control calculates the max. operating frequency for the winch motor in dependence on the lifted load (5), with continuous comparison of the actual frequency with the max. frequency for rev regulation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 13/26; B66D 1/48; H02P 7/628

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66D 1/12 (2006.01); B66C 13/26 (2006.01); B66D 1/48 (2006.01); B66D 1/58 (2006.01); H02P 27/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66D 1/485 (2013.01); B66C 13/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0710619 A2 19960508; EP 0710619 A3 19960515; EP 0710619 B1 20000412; DE 4440420 A1 19960509; DE 4440420 C2 19970320; DE 4440420 C3 20030724; JP 3803128 B2 20060802; JP H08208189 A 19960813; US 5818185 A 19981006

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59508166

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140630

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131031

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121022

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121023

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121031

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-02-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-06-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508166 20000518

2000-05-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2000-05-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000413

2000-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-05-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980324

1997-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961113

1996-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1996-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT