Global Patent Index - EP 0710738 B1

EP 0710738 B1 2000-09-27 - FIBER PRODUCT PROCESSING METHOD

Title (en)

FIBER PRODUCT PROCESSING METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BEHANDELN VON TEXTILIEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT D'UN PRODUIT FIBREUX

Publication

EP 0710738 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94921106 A

Priority

  • JP 9401171 W
  • JP 18125693 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0710738A1] A textile treatment method for providing a textile with water- and oil-repellency by treating a textile with a salt of metal having a valency of at least two, and then treating the textile with hydrophilic functional group-containing fluoropolymer capable of coordinating with that metal, can stably provide the textile with high initial water- and oil-repellency and high permanent water- and oil-repellency.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06M 15/356; D06M 15/277

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06M 11/00 (2006.01); D06M 11/46 (2006.01); D06M 15/263 (2006.01); D06M 15/277 (2006.01); D06M 15/356 (2006.01); D06M 101/00 (2006.01); D06M 101/16 (2006.01); D06M 101/30 (2006.01); D06M 101/32 (2006.01); D06M 101/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06M 15/277 (2013.01); D06M 15/263 (2013.01); D06M 15/3564 (2013.01); D06M 15/3566 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0710738 A1 19960508; EP 0710738 A4 19960731; EP 0710738 B1 20000927; CN 1084814 C 20020515; CN 1127536 A 19960724; DE 69426025 D1 20001102; DE 69426025 T2 20010517; JP 3284672 B2 20020520; JP H0734384 A 19950203; TW 278104 B 19960611; WO 9503445 A1 19950202

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070718

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-07-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060719

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-07-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060713

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-03-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-09-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-07-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010718

2000-12-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69426025

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-02

2000-10-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-09-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980807

1996-07-31 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

1996-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1996-05-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960122

1996-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT