Global patent index - EP 0710809 B1

EP 0710809 B1 2001-02-21 - Process and apparatus for compressing a gaseous mixture to be distilled and for expanding at least one gaseous stream

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for compressing a gaseous mixture to be distilled and for expanding at least one gaseous stream

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verdichten eines zu destillierenden Gasgemisches und zum Entspannen wenigstens eines Gasstromes

Title (fr)

Procédé et installation de compression d'un mélange gazeux à distiller et de détente d'au moins un flux gazeux

Publication

EP 0710809 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95402338 A

Priority

FR 9412715 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0710809A1] The procedure consists of compressing a first flow of a gas mixture in a compressor (5) with at least one compression stage (5A, 5B, 5C), compressing a second gas mixture flow to a higher pressure in a compressor (7), expanding a third flow of a gas mixture in an expander (9), recuperating at least part of the energy generated by the expander with the compressor (7), and feeding at least part of the second flow back to one stage (5B) of compressor (5). The first and second flows are of air destined to be distilled in an air distillation plant, while the third gas flow is a product of the distillation plant (13). Appts. is also claimed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 13/02 (2006.01); F02G 5/02 (2006.01); F25B 9/06 (2006.01); F25J 3/02 (2006.01); F25J 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04018 (2013.01); F25J 3/04139 (2013.01); F25J 3/04309 (2013.01); F25J 3/04315 (2013.01); F25J 3/04381 (2013.01); F25J 3/04412 (2013.01); F25J 2200/20 (2013.01); F25J 2230/24 (2013.01); Y10S 62/91 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0710809 A1 19960508; EP 0710809 B1 20010221; BR 9504523 A 19970527; CN 1086445 C 20020619; CN 1133392 A 19961016; DE 69520134 D1 20010329; DE 69520134 T2 20010719; FR 2726046 A1 19960426; FR 2726046 B1 19961220; JP H08226758 A 19960903; US 5560223 A 19961001

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071020

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071020

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050914

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20071020

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-09-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060925

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-09-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060914

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-02-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010327

2001-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69520134

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-03-29

2001-02-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-06-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR COMPRESSING A GASEOUS MIXTURE TO BE DISTILLED AND FOR EXPANDING AT LEAST ONE GASEOUS STREAM

2000-03-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR COMPRESSING A GASEOUS MIXTURE TO BE DISTILLED AND FOR EXPANDING AT LEAST ONE GASEOUS STREAM

1998-12-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981020

1997-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961108

1996-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT