Global Patent Index - EP 0710939 B1

EP 0710939 B1 2000-08-16 - Small-sized alarm device

Title (en)

Small-sized alarm device

Title (de)

Alarmvorrichtung mit kleinen Abmessungen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'alarme de petites dimensions

Publication

EP 0710939 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95117282 A

Priority

  • JP 27082094 A
  • JP 27082294 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0710939A1] A small-sized alarm device (100) is hung on a doorknob to emit an alarm sound upon detecting that a human body contacts or approaches the doorknob. The alarm device (100) has data processing means, such as a calculator (101, 106, S717) and the like, in addition to an alarm means (101, 103, S705) and an electro-optic display (102) for displaying data processed by the data processing means and information related to the operation of the alarm means. To the alarm device is rotatably mounted a hanging member (421) for hanging the alarm device on a doorknob. The hanging member (421) is fit into the fitting (429) of the case (403) of the alarm device when in not use or is erected from the case (403) when the alarm device is hung on the doorknob. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0710939 A1 19960508; EP 0710939 B1 20000816; CN 1135620 A 19961113; DE 69518387 D1 20000921; DE 69518387 T2 20001228; FI 955284 A0 19951103; FI 955284 A 19960505; HK 1013487 A1 20010427

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090731

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071108

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071025

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2002-11-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021102

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011031

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69518387 20000921

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990609

1998-05-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CASIO COMPUTER CO., LTD.

1996-05-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951102

1996-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB