Global Patent Index - EP 0710976 B1

EP 0710976 B1 2000-02-02 - Rotating anode X-ray tube with slide bearing

Title (en)

Rotating anode X-ray tube with slide bearing

Title (de)

Drehanoden-Röntgenröhre mit einem Gleitlager

Title (fr)

Tube à rayons X à anode rotative avec palier à glissement

Publication

EP 0710976 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95202896 A

Priority

DE 4439143 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0710976A1] The rotating anode X-ray tube has a plain bearing which comprises a fixed and a rotatable bearing part (8,9) with another facing bearing surface, at least one of which is grooved (11) so that when operating a liq. lubricant is between the bearing surfaces. A solid with a low sliding friction is added to the lubricant.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 35/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 35/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 35/101 (2013.01); H01J 2235/106 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0710976 A1 19960508; EP 0710976 B1 20000202; DE 4439143 A1 19960509; JP H08212949 A 19960820; US 5619549 A 19970408

INPADOC legal status


2002-02-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2001-07-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-02 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-07-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507730 20000309

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-02-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-01-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2000-01-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

1998-08-26 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG GMBH

1998-08-26 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

1997-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19961223

1997-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961108

1996-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL