Global Patent Index - EP 0711008 B1

EP 0711008 B1 2001-03-07 - Coaxial right angle connector for mounting to a circuit board

Title (en)

Coaxial right angle connector for mounting to a circuit board

Title (de)

Koaxialer Winkelverbinder zur Montage auf einer Leiterplatte

Title (fr)

Connecteur coaxial rectangulaire pour le montage sur un circuit imprimé

Publication

EP 0711008 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95113354 A

Priority

DE 4438872 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4438872C1] The angle connector has at least two coaxial contacts (3) with plug and socket sections at their opposite ends, held in an electrically conductive 2-part housing block (1). The inner conductors (4) of the coaxial contacts are electrically insulated relative to the housing halves by internal recesses (12) provided in the latter, with an electrical screening wall inserted between the coaxial contacts. The screening wall is in the form of a partition wall section of each housing half shell, with the partition wall sections overlapping when the housing half shells are fitted together.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 24/02; H01R 13/502

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/646 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/50 (2013.01); H01R 12/724 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 4438872 C1 19951207; EP 0711008 A2 19960508; EP 0711008 A3 19980225; EP 0711008 B1 20010307; US 5577935 A 19961126

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150824

2015-09-16 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150824

2015-08-25 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59509074

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140808

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140820

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140821

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-01-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-06-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-02-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010615

2001-05-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509074 20010412

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-10-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 24/02 A, 7H 01R 13/502 B

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000808

1998-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980309

1998-03-11 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01R 17/04

1998-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-11-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HARTING KGAA

1996-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB