Global patent index - EP 0711009 B1

EP 0711009 B1 2000-01-05 - Electrical connector

Title (en)

Electrical connector

Title (de)

Elektrische Steckverbindung

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique

Publication

EP 0711009 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95116923 A

Priority

DE 4439105 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0711009A2] The connector has a rectangular cross-section plug pin and a socket which is formed from stamped and bent sheet metal with a rectangular cross-section contact part (3) for receiving the plug pin, having a separate contact element (6). This is formed from a U-shaped contact plate, with 2 parallel contact arms (8), at least one of which has a widened section at its end which is bent round to form a rectangular frame, secured to the contact part via fixing lugs (17) of the latter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 43/16; H01R 13/02; H01R 13/187

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/10 (2006.01); H01R 13/187 (2006.01); H01R 13/35 (2006.01); H01R 13/504 (2006.01); H01R 13/639 (2006.01); H01R 4/02 (2006.01); H01R 4/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/187 (2013.01); H01R 13/35 (2013.01); H01R 4/02 (2013.01); H01R 4/18 (2013.01); H01R 13/113 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 3906625 C1 19900118 - KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4439105 C1 19960425; BR 9504908 A 19970902; EP 0711009 A2 19960508; EP 0711009 A3 19971203; EP 0711009 B1 20000105; ES 2142986 T3 20000501; JP H08236185 A 19960913; US 5613885 A 19970325

INPADOC legal status

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2007-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20051028

2006-10-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20051027

2006-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2005-10-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051028

2005-10-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-10-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051027

2004-09-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040923

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040921

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040917

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040814

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-05-17 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

- Ref Legal Event Code: FC

2002-05-03 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RN

2002-02-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-05-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000407

2000-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2142986

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-04-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59507570

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-10

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-01-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000105

1998-07-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980616

1998-04-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980219

1997-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1996-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE