Global Patent Index - EP 0711261 B9

EP 0711261 B9 2002-11-13 - ZIRCONIA PARTICLES

Title (en)

ZIRCONIA PARTICLES

Title (de)

ZIRKONIUMOXID PARTIKEL

Title (fr)

PARTICULES DE ZIRCONE

Publication

EP 0711261 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 94922174 A

Priority

  • AU 9400425 W
  • AU PM024793 A
  • AU PM024893 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9504012A1] Porous zirconia or zirconium-containing particles, methods of making such particles and methods of using such particles including modifications to the surface of the particles are described. The method comprises heating zirconia particles to provide a substantially homogeneously liquid melt, quenching the particles of melt to effect spinodal decomposition to provide quench particles of a silica rich phase and a zirconia rich phase, annealing the quenched particles to provide non porous solid particles of zirconia and silica and, leaching the silica from these particles to produce porous solid zirconia particles comprising a three dimensionally substantially continuous inter penetrating network of interconnected pores.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C04B 35/482; B01J 20/32; C01G 25/02; C04B 35/48; C04B 35/626; C04B 38/08; G01N 30/48; G01N 33/551

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 20/281 (2006.01); B01J 20/06 (2006.01); B01J 20/32 (2006.01); C01G 25/02 (2006.01); C02F 1/28 (2006.01); C04B 35/14 (2006.01); C04B 35/48 (2006.01); C04B 35/626 (2006.01); C04B 38/00 (2006.01); C04B 38/08 (2006.01); C12N 11/14 (2006.01); G01N 30/88 (2006.01); G01N 33/551 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 20/287 (2013.01); B01J 20/06 (2013.01); B01J 20/28004 (2013.01); B01J 20/28057 (2013.01); B01J 20/28078 (2013.01); B01J 20/282 (2013.01); B01J 20/283 (2013.01); B01J 20/305 (2013.01); B01J 20/3085 (2013.01); B01J 20/3204 (2013.01); B01J 20/3219 (2013.01); B01J 20/3225 (2013.01); B01J 20/3259 (2013.01); B01J 20/327 (2013.01); B01J 20/3274 (2013.01); B01J 20/328 (2013.01); B01J 20/3282 (2013.01); B01J 20/3293 (2013.01); B01J 41/05 (2017.01); B01J 41/07 (2017.01); B01J 41/13 (2017.01); C01G 25/02 (2013.01); C04B 35/626 (2013.01); C04B 38/009 (2013.01); C04B 38/08 (2013.01); G01N 33/551 (2013.01); B01J 2220/42 (2013.01); B01J 2220/54 (2013.01); C01P 2004/03 (2013.01); C01P 2004/61 (2013.01); C01P 2006/12 (2013.01); C01P 2006/16 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C04B 38/009 + C04B 35/48 + C04B 38/04 + C04B 41/00 + C04B 41/4584
  2. C04B 38/08 + C04B 35/48

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9504012 A1 19950209; AT 216688 T 20020515; CA 2168240 A1 19950209; DE 69430479 D1 20020529; DE 69430479 T2 20021128; DK 0711261 T3 20020812; EP 0711261 A1 19960515; EP 0711261 A4 19981014; EP 0711261 B1 20020424; EP 0711261 B9 20021113; JP H09503989 A 19970422; US 5910462 A 19990608; US 6319868 B1 20011120

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050728

2004-05-05 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-07-28 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030728

2003-05-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-04-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030127

2003-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020728

2003-03-10 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2003-03-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-02-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030201

2002-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-10-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-12 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020729

2002-07-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020728

2002-07-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020728

2002-07-24 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-07-24 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20020724

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-06-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-05-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69430479 20020529

2002-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-04-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020424

2002-04-24 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020424

2002-04-24 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020424

2002-04-24 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020424

2002-04-24 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020424

2002-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 216688 T 20020515

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990702

1998-10-14 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19980901

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1996-05-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960120

1996-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE