Global Patent Index - EP 0711364 B1

EP 0711364 B1 2000-06-28 - SPINNING DEVICE WITH A MOBILE JOINT

Title (en)

SPINNING DEVICE WITH A MOBILE JOINT

Title (de)

SPINNVORRICHTUNG MIT BEWEGLICHEM GELENK

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE FILAGE A ARTICULATION MOBILE

Publication

EP 0711364 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95919269 A

Priority

  • AT 9500097 W
  • AT 107194 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9533087A1] The invention concerns a spinning device for the production of synthetic fibres, in particular regenerated-cellulose fibres, the device consisting of at least one feed pump (10, 20, 30), at least one feed line (11, 21, 31), at least one spinning nozzle (12, 22, 32) and a trough-like container used as the regenerating bath. Each of the feed lines can be pivoted about at least one joint (13, 23, 33). The device is characterized in that each joint is mounted so that it can move essentially horizontally and vertically. A special embodiment of the invention is characterized in that each joint is mounted so that it can pivot about a point of rotation (14, 24, 34). The device proposed enables the nozzles to be lifted easily out of a bath deep enough to give a long fibre-immersion distance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01D 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 1/06 (2006.01); D01D 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9533087 A1 19951207; AT 400849 B 19960325; AT A107194 A 19950815; AU 2518295 A 19951221; BR 9506246 A 19970812; CN 1129019 A 19960814; DE 59508510 D1 20000803; EP 0711364 A1 19960515; EP 0711364 B1 20000628; JP H09501475 A 19970210; US 5714172 A 19980203

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-06-21 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-06-21 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-11-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508510 20000803

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2000-06-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000628

1998-06-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980421

1996-05-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960124

1996-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI