Global Patent Index - EP 0711607 B1

EP 0711607 B1 2000-07-12 - Process for operating a screw centrifuge

Title (en)

Process for operating a screw centrifuge

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betrieb von Schneckenzentrifugen

Title (fr)

Procédé de fonctionnement des centrifugeuses à vis

Publication

EP 0711607 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95116855 A

Priority

DE 4439938 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0711607A1] A process for operating a worm centrifuge for sepg. liq.-solid mixts. in light (liq.) and heavy (solid) materials, consists of a cylindrical centrifuge drum with a conical drum end, which can be rotated about its longitudinal axis. The drum wall surrounds an advancing worm and has an outlet for the sepd. material. The radial spacing of the outlet opening from the drum axis is less than the spacing of the drum wall from the axis. The rotational speeds of the centrifuge drum and the advancing worm are almost the same when the unit is turned off, and heavy materials remain in the unit. When the unit is started up, the rotational speeds are the same. The worm speed is adjusted once the min. drum speed is reached.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B04B 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B04B 1/20 (2006.01); B04B 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B04B 1/2016 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0711607 A1 19960515; EP 0711607 B1 20000712; AT 194507 T 20000715; DE 4439938 A1 19960515; ES 2151574 T3 20010101; JP H08323240 A 19961210

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031027

2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040501

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2004-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2004-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BAKER HUGHES (DEUTSCHLAND) G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031027

2003-10-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031026

2002-11-06 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20021106

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-25 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20021025

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-11 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20021011

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-03 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20021003

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-02 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021002

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151574 T3

2000-10-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508557 20000817

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR NL

2000-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194507 T 20000715

2000-03-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAKER HUGHES (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH

1999-08-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAKER HUGHES (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH

1999-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990118

1997-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEUTZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1997-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961111

1996-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR NL