Global Patent Index - EP 0711821 B1

EP 0711821 B1 2000-05-17 - Salt precoat as lubricant carrier for metal forming

Title (en)

Salt precoat as lubricant carrier for metal forming

Title (de)

Schmiermittelträgersalz für die Metallumformung

Title (fr)

Revêtement de sel porteur de lubrifiant pour la déformation des métaux

Publication

EP 0711821 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95115908 A

Priority

DE 4440301 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0711821A1] Lubricant carrier salt is based on boric acid and/or alkali borate and contains aliphatic di- or tri-carboxylic acid (non)substd. by at least one OH group and their alkali salts The wt. ratio of boric acid/alkali borate (calc. as H3BO3) to carboxylic acid (calc. as citric acid) is 5-15:1. Also claimed is a process for facilitating cold forming of iron or steel workpieces, in which the lubricant carrier salt is applied as an aq. soln. or dispersion in a concn. of 5-30 wt. % and at 80-100 degrees C, to form a phosphate coating.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 111/02; B21C 9/02; C10M 111/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 9/02 (2006.01); C10M 111/02 (2006.01); C10M 111/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 111/04 (2013.01); B21C 9/02 (2013.01); C10M 111/02 (2013.01); C10M 2201/003 (2013.01); C10M 2201/0403 (2013.01); C10M 2201/0433 (2013.01); C10M 2201/0603 (2013.01); C10M 2201/0613 (2013.01); C10M 2201/0623 (2013.01); C10M 2201/0653 (2013.01); C10M 2201/0663 (2013.01); C10M 2201/08 (2013.01); C10M 2201/0803 (2013.01); C10M 2201/081 (2013.01); C10M 2201/082 (2013.01); C10M 2201/084 (2013.01); C10M 2201/0853 (2013.01); C10M 2201/0863 (2013.01); C10M 2201/087 (2013.01); C10M 2201/0873 (2013.01); C10M 2201/1006 (2013.01); C10M 2201/102 (2013.01); C10M 2201/1023 (2013.01); C10M 2201/1033 (2013.01); C10M 2201/1053 (2013.01); C10M 2201/123 (2013.01); C10M 2207/1203 (2013.01); C10M 2207/1213 (2013.01); C10M 2207/1233 (2013.01); C10M 2207/124 (2013.01); C10M 2207/125 (2013.01); C10M 2207/1253 (2013.01); C10M 2207/1273 (2013.01); C10M 2207/129 (2013.01); C10M 2207/1293 (2013.01); C10M 2207/163 (2013.01); C10M 2207/183 (2013.01); C10M 2207/203 (2013.01); C10M 2207/223 (2013.01); C10M 2207/243 (2013.01); C10M 2209/12 (2013.01); C10M 2209/123 (2013.01); C10N 2210/01 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C10M 111/02 + C10M 103/00 + C10M 103/00 + C10M 103/00 + C10M 105/24 + C10M 105/26
  2. C10M 111/04 + C10M 103/00 + C10M 103/00 + C10M 103/00 + C10M 103/06 + C10M 105/24 + C10M 105/26 + C10M 107/36
  3. C10M 2201/003 + C10M 2201/003
  4. C10M 2201/003 + C10M 2201/003 + C10M 2201/003
  5. C10M 2201/0433 + C10M 2201/0433 + C10M 2201/0433
  6. C10M 2201/0433 + C10M 2201/0433
  7. C10M 2201/0403 + C10M 2201/0403
  8. C10M 2201/0403 + C10M 2201/0403 + C10M 2201/0403

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0711821 A1 19960515; EP 0711821 B1 20000517; AT 193049 T 20000615; DE 4440301 A1 19960515; ES 2148394 T3 20001016; US 5584945 A 19961217

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101011

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101010

2011-11-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111118

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101010

2011-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-08-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59508345

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CHEMETAL G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20101031

2010-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20091130

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091217

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091110

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-01-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20091015

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091023

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *CHEMETAL G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050105

2005-05-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-04-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

2005-01-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *CHEMETAL G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050105

2002-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-06-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-05-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011010

2002-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011011

2001-10-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011010

2001-07-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: MG TECHNOLOGIES AG

2001-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MG TECHNOLOGIES AG

2000-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148394 T3

2000-10-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20001002

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-09-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20000925

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-09-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20000915

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-08-17 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508345 20000621

2000-06-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193049 T 20000615

1999-02-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990112

1999-01-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: METALLGESELLSCHAFT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1997-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961115

1996-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE