Global Patent Index - EP 0711861 B1

EP 0711861 B1 2000-03-15 - Rotating roller for an ironing machine with curved surface

Title (en)

Rotating roller for an ironing machine with curved surface

Title (de)

Drehbare Bügelwalze für Bügelmaschine mit einer Bügelmulde

Title (fr)

Cylindre tournant pour sécheuse-repasseuse à cuvette

Publication

EP 0711861 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95402490 A

Priority

FR 9413558 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0711861A1] A cylinder (12) is made from a series of metal sheet sectors (32) with guide combs (36) between and an outer elastic covering. The sectors (32) are identical in size, have uniform perforations, and are separated by slots (40) which contain the combs. Pref. the sectors which make up the cylinder have in-turned edges to which the combs are attached or, in a variant the combs are made as a part of the sectors' edges. The cylinder is supported by a central tube (28) on end flanges (28) with apertures (31) for steam to pass through.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 67/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 67/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 67/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0711861 A1 19960515; EP 0711861 B1 20000315; DE 69515595 D1 20000420; DE 69515595 T2 20001102; DE 711861 T1 19961024; DK 0711861 T3 20000821; FR 2726835 A1 19960515; FR 2726835 B1 19970131

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-09 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20151107

2015-11-07 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69515595

2015-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20141118

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-21 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-05-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69515595 20000420

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK IT

1999-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990324

1997-11-05 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: ELECTROLUX SYSTEMES DE BLANCHISSERIE

1997-10-15 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: ELECTROLUX SYSTEMES DE BLANCHISSERIE SNC

1996-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961022

1996-10-24 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

1996-06-05 [ITCL] IT: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

- Representative's name: JACOBACCI CASETTA & PERANI S.P.A.

1996-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK IT