Global Patent Index - EP 0711895 B1

EP 0711895 B1 2000-03-08 - Fitting system for a locking bar

Title (en)

Fitting system for a locking bar

Title (de)

Beschlagsystem für Stangenverschlüsse

Title (fr)

Système de ferrure pour espagnolette

Publication

EP 0711895 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95116806 A

Priority

DE 9418008 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0711895A1] The fastening claw (1) has a neck part (2) which holds the end of the fastening rod and is mounted in a one-piece guide holder (8) fixable to the shutter so as to pivot on the fastening rod's longitudinal axle. The guide holder has a through-hole (16) coaxial with the fastening rod's longitudinal axis and in which the neck part axially fits with a radially compressible end (4). The circular cylindrical sectioned compressible end has at least one longitudinal slot (7) in its outer casing opening out onto its free end (5). The free end has an outer flange (6) gripping behind a thrust edge (18) of the guide holder, when the neck part is inserted into the guide holder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/08 (2006.01); E05C 9/18 (2006.01); E05C 9/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 9418008 U1 19951221; AT 190378 T 20000315; EP 0711895 A1 19960515; EP 0711895 B1 20000308

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111025

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 190378 T

- Effective date: 20111025

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111025

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101026

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101014

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081231

- Year of fee payment: 14

2001-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507949 20000413

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT

2000-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190378 T 20000315

2000-02-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990714

1997-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961111

1996-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT