Global Patent Index - EP 0711962 B1

EP 0711962 B1 2000-02-23 - Electric storage heating apparatus

Title (en)

Electric storage heating apparatus

Title (de)

Elektro-Speicherheizgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de chauffage électrique à accumulation

Publication

EP 0711962 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95115377 A

Priority

DE 4439985 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0711962A1] The storage heating device has a heat storage core (2) heated via an electric heating element (3) and enclosed by a housing (1) which has entry and exit openings (6,7) for a flow channel (5), through which air is circulated via an electric fan (8). The flow channel contains a heat exchanger (10) with heat exchange surfaces for transfer of heat stored in the core to the circulated air stream, with the heat exchange coupling factor between the core and the heat exchanger pref. being variable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/04 (2006.01); F24H 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 7/0416 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0711962 A1 19960515; EP 0711962 B1 20000223; AT 189921 T 20000315; CZ 286368 B6 20000315; CZ 9502633 A3 19960515; DE 4439985 A1 19960515; ES 2145861 T3 20000716; PL 179932 B1 20001130; PL 311182 A1 19960513

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040930

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040929

2003-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030930

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030922

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030904

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030829

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: KULMBACHER KLIMAGERATE-WERK G.M.B.H. KKW

- Effective date: 20000930

2001-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145861 T3

2000-06-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507838 20000330

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR

2000-02-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189921 T 20000315

1998-06-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980429

1997-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961031

1996-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR