Global Patent Index - EP 0712265 B1

EP 0712265 B1 2000-02-02 - Electronic assembly

Title (en)

Electronic assembly

Title (de)

Baugruppe

Title (fr)

Assemblage électronique

Publication

EP 0712265 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95117201 A

Priority

DE 4439471 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0712265A1] The device has a housing (1,3) formed in one or more parts. It also has a plug unit (10) with terminal pins (11) and a circuit board (2) with conductive tracks (21). The circuit board (2) receives components (25). The plug unit (10) is formed integrally with the housing (1, 3). The circuit board (2) is arranged such that the terminal pins (11) of the plug unit (10) are guided directly onto or into the circuit board (2). Contact surfaces (20) may be provided on the circuit board (2). The contact surfaces make contact with the flexible plug terminal pins (11) by pressing the pins (11) onto the contact surfaces (20). Reinforcing members (14) may be provided in the plug unit (10) to prevent the pins (11) being deflected or bent back when they are pressed against the contact surfaces (20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05K 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/71 (2011.01); H05K 3/32 (2006.01); H05K 5/00 (2006.01); H05K 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05K 5/006 (2013.01); H01R 12/712 (2013.01); H05K 5/0069 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4439471 A1 19960509; EP 0712265 A1 19960515; EP 0712265 B1 20000202; ES 2143576 T3 20000516; US 6233153 B1 20010515

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20151103

2016-02-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160226

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20151101

2015-11-25 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20151101

2015-11-02 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59507733

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141126

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141130

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143576 T3

2000-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000321

2000-04-12 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: TEMIC TELEFUNKEN MICROELECTRONIC GMBH

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507733 20000309

2000-02-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-01-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981204

1997-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961107

1996-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE