Global Patent Index - EP 0712770 B8

EP 0712770 B8 2002-11-20 - Antiskid control device

Title (en)

Antiskid control device

Title (de)

Antirutsch-Steuerungsgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de régulation antipatinage

Publication

EP 0712770 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 95117689 A

Priority

JP 28183394 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0712770A2] An antiskid control device (K1-K5) which calculates an estimated fluid pressure (PTi) of each of wheel cylinders (2A-2D) under antiskid control in each control cycle so as to adjust a fluid pressure of each of the wheel cylinders (2A-2D) on the basis of the estimated fluid pressure (PTi) and behaviors of wheels, comprising: a differential pressure detecting member which detects a difference between a fluid pressure of a master cylinder (1) and the fluid pressure of each of the wheel cylinders (2A-2D) so as to produce an output signal indicative of the difference between the fluid pressure of the master cylinder (1) and the fluid pressure of each of the wheel cylinders (2A-2D); wherein when on the basis of the output signal of the differential pressure detecting member (SS, SSW, PSWi, SPSi), the difference between the fluid pressure of the master cylinder (1) and the fluid pressure of each of the wheel cylinders (2A-2D) is found to be in the vicinity of zero, the estimated fluid pressure (PTi) of each of the wheel cylinders (2A-2D) is set to a predetermined value (PTmax) by stopping addition in calculation of the estimated fluid pressure (PTi). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60T 8/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60T 8/58 (2006.01); B60T 8/1761 (2006.01); B60T 8/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60T 8/4275 (2013.01); B60T 8/17613 (2013.01); Y10S 303/01 (2013.01); Y10S 303/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0712770 A2 19960522; EP 0712770 A3 19981104; EP 0712770 B1 20020220; EP 0712770 B8 20021120; DE 69525505 D1 20020328; DE 69525505 T2 20021002; JP 3428181 B2 20030722; JP H08142836 A 19960604; KR 0184667 B1 19990401; US 5545929 A 19960813

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071109

2008-11-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080930

2008-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071109

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071101

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-11-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061108

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-11-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061108

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-02-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021121

2002-10-23 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FUJIOKA, HIDEAKI, C/O ITAMI WORKS * YASUZUMI, KAZUMI, C/O ITAMI WORKS

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69525505 20020328

2002-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010221

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-05-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951109

1996-05-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB