Global Patent Index - EP 0712784 B1

EP 0712784 B1 2000-02-09 - Container formed from sheet material and blank for forming same

Title (en)

Container formed from sheet material and blank for forming same

Title (de)

Behälter aus Folienmaterial und Zuschnitt zur Herstellung desselben

Title (fr)

Caisses en une matière en feuille et flans pour la réalisation de telles caisses

Publication

EP 0712784 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96100892 A

Priority

  • EP 93110403 A
  • EP 91402004 A
  • FR 9009457 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0468860A1] Container of sheet material, such as cardboard or corrugated cardboard, comprising square or rectangular lateral faces connected in pairs by a folding line, the said folding lines being mutually parallel. …<??>According to the invention, such a container comprises at least five lateral faces. It may be obtained by rolling up a blank of sheet material around a core interacting with a pressure plate whose profile corresponds to that of two or three consecutive faces of the said core. …<IMAGE>…

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 1/28 (2006.01); B31B 3/26 (2006.01); B31B 3/28 (2006.01); B65D 5/00 (2006.01); B65D 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/0227 (2013.01); B65D 5/001 (2013.01); B65D 5/02 (2013.01); B65D 5/029 (2013.01); B31B 50/28 (2017.08); B31B 50/44 (2017.08); B65D 2301/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0468860 A1 19920129; EP 0468860 B1 19940406; AT 103870 T 19940415; AT 142158 T 19960915; AT 189658 T 20000215; AT 211680 T 20020115; AT 211699 T 20020115; AU 640503 B2 19930826; AU 8117191 A 19920206; CA 2047497 A1 19920125; CA 2047497 C 19980707; DE 468860 T1 19930408; DE 69101604 D1 19940511; DE 69101604 T2 19940804; DE 69121910 D1 19961010; DE 69121910 T2 19970123; DE 69131986 D1 20000316; DE 69131986 T2 20000629; DE 69132906 D1 20020228; DE 69132906 T2 20020822; DE 69132907 D1 20020228; DE 69132907 T2 20020822; DE 9116739 U1 19930812; DK 0468860 T3 19940808; DK 0570023 T3 19961216; EP 0570023 A2 19931118; EP 0570023 A3 19931201; EP 0570023 B1 19960904; EP 0712784 A2 19960522; EP 0712784 A3 19960731; EP 0712784 B1 20000209; EP 0965441 A1 19991222; EP 0965441 B1 20020109; EP 0965528 A1 19991222; EP 0965528 B1 20020109; ES 2051569 T3 19940616; ES 2092190 T3 19961116; ES 2142508 T3 20000416; ES 2168822 T3 20020616; ES 2168823 T3 20020616; FI 913549 A0 19910724; FI 913549 A 19920125; FI 97356 B 19960830; FI 97356 C 19961210; FR 2665137 A1 19920131; FR 2665137 B1 19940701; GR 3021122 T3 19961231; HK 1000065 A1 19971107; HK 27897 A 19970306; HU 219570 B 20010528; HU 912468 D0 19911230; HU T66762 A 19941228; IE 68598 B1 19960626; IE 912417 A1 19920129; IL 98736 A 19961205; IL 98736 D0 19920715; JP 2005008280 A 20050113; JP 3304991 B2 20020722; JP 3631033 B2 20050323; JP 3634654 B2 20050330; JP H04239442 A 19920827; JP H11262961 A 19990928; JP H11263330 A 19990928; NO 304642 B1 19990125; NO 912873 A 19920127; NO 912873 D0 19910723; NZ 238824 A 19940826; OA 9385 A 19920915; PT 98423 A 19930930; PT 98423 B 19940630; US 5147271 A 19920915

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20020810

2002-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-04-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020201

2002-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-03-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010717

2002-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020201

2002-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-07-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010717

2001-07-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010717

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-16 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20000816

- Year of fee payment: 10

2000-08-11 [EN4] FR: NOTIFICATION OF NON FILING TRANSLATION IN AN EARLIER BOPI IS ERRONEOUS

2000-07-17 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000717

2000-07-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20000717

- Year of fee payment: 10

2000-07-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20000705

- Year of fee payment: 10

2000-06-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20000629

- Year of fee payment: 10

2000-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20000629

- Year of fee payment: 10

2000-06-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20000629

- Year of fee payment: 10

2000-06-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20000627

- Year of fee payment: 10

2000-05-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000427

2000-05-09 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000509

2000-05-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000509

2000-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2142508 T3

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69131986 20000316

2000-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: JOHN P. MUNZINGER INGENIEUR-CONSEIL

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-09 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 468860

2000-02-09 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 570023

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

2000-02-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-02-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-02-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189658 T 20000215

1998-04-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980305

1996-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961023

1996-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

1996-05-22 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 570023

1996-05-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES GB GR IT LI LU NL SE