Global Patent Index - EP 0712787 B1

EP 0712787 B1 2001-01-03 - Method for manufactoring a container

Title (en)

Method for manufactoring a container

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Behälters

Title (fr)

Méthodede de fabrication d'un récipient

Publication

EP 0712787 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95115735 A

Priority

DE 4440701 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0712787A1] The container (1) has a container jacket (3) and an end wall (2). Its emptying aperture (4) is covered by a covering strip (5). This strip covers part of the surface of the end wall. The covering strip is extended into the region of the container jacket so that it cannot come away due to the contents moving away from the end wall when not intended to do so. The strip is pressed against the external upper surface of the container jacket, from which it can at least in part be released. The cover strip may be fitted in such a way that it provides a sealed cover for the drink zone of the container, being sealed against the end wall.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 17/50; B65B 61/18; B65D 3/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 61/18 (2006.01); B65D 3/26 (2006.01); B65D 17/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 3/268 (2013.01); B65B 61/184 (2013.01); B65D 17/502 (2013.01); B65D 2517/0013 (2013.01); B65D 2517/0029 (2013.01); B65D 2517/0061 (2013.01); B65D 2517/0086 (2013.01); B65D 2517/0098 (2013.01); B65D 2517/5027 (2013.01); B65D 2517/5083 (2013.01); B65D 2517/5091 (2013.01); Y10S 493/963 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0712787 A1 19960522; EP 0712787 B1 20010103; DE 4440701 A1 19960523; US 6129268 A 20001010

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051006

2002-08-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-06-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020628

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508937 20010208

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-09-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DATA SOLLECITO LETT. INC.:02/03/2001;DE DOMINICIS

2000-04-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR MANUFACTORING A CONTAINER

1997-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970429

1996-06-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960427

1996-05-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT