Global Patent Index - EP 0712801 B1

EP 0712801 B1 2001-05-02 - Bidirectional pivoting frame of a paper roll changing apparatus

Title (en)

Bidirectional pivoting frame of a paper roll changing apparatus

Title (de)

Zweirichtungsschwenkrahmen einer Papierrollenwechseleinrichtung

Title (fr)

Châssis pivotant bidirectionnellement d'un dispositif de changement de rouleaux de papier

Publication

EP 0712801 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95117576 A

Priority

DE 4441142 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5562038A] A bidirectional pivot frame of a paper web changing device is supported for pivotal motion about a selected one of two pivot axes. The support for the pivot frame is accomplished by slidable locking supports that positively lock one set of pivot pins in place in guide slots in the side frames of the paper web changing device, while releasing a second set of guide pins. The slidable locking supports are shiftable to selectively positively lock the desired set of guide pins in place.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/18; B65H 26/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/10 (2006.01); B65H 19/18 (2006.01); B65H 26/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/1873 (2013.01); B65H 19/1815 (2013.01); B65H 26/00 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4641 (2013.01); B65H 2403/942 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5562038 A 19961008; DE 4441142 A1 19960523; DE 4441142 C2 19990930; EP 0712801 A1 19960522; EP 0712801 B1 20010502; JP 2591934 B2 19970319; JP H08217297 A 19960827

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2006-12-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061204

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-11-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051108

2006-07-25 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-07-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051109

2005-11-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051108

2005-11-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051108

2004-11-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20041124

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-11-19 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20041119

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-11-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041118

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-10-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041025

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-04-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509227 20010607

2001-05-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2001-04-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-03-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: BIDIRECTIONAL PIVOTING FRAME OF A PAPER ROLL CHANGING APPARATUS

1999-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990623

1998-12-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1996-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960731

1996-05-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE