Global patent index - EP 0712805 B1

EP 0712805 B1 2000-08-02 - Reach forklift

Title (en)

Reach forklift

Title (de)

Schubgabelstapler

Title (fr)

Chariot élévateur à longue portée

Publication

EP 0712805 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95119390 A

Priority

  • EP 95119390 A
  • EP 93108095 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0712805A2] A reach forklift comprises: a forklift body; left and right straddle arms; a pair of load wheels supported in a steerable manner in the vicinity of front ends of the left and right straddle arms, respectively; driving means for steering the load wheels, the load wheels and the driving means being housed in the straddle arms; a drive wheel disposed in a rear portion of the forklift body; and a steering wheel for steering the drive wheel; steering angle detecting means for detecting steering angles of the left and right load wheels and the drive wheel; a control device (116) for, in a first mode, determining a steering angle (L,R) of one of said load wheels (105,106) by multiplying a steering angle (D) of said drive wheel (104) by a predetermined steering angle gain (GL,GR), for calculating a turning centre from a geometric relationship between said drive wheel (104) and said one load wheel, and for controlling the steering so that an extension line (HR,HL) of the rotation axis of the other load wheel passes through said turning centre. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 9/075

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/075 (2006.01); B66F 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/10 (2013.01); B66F 9/07568 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

JP S57121599 A 19820729 - SHINKO ELECTRIC CO LTD

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0712805 A2 19960522; EP 0712805 A3 19960605; EP 0712805 B1 20000802; DE 69315198 D1 19971218; DE 69315198 T2 19980305

INPADOC legal status

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130517

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130522

2013-06-12 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20130517

2013-05-22 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69329156

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120608

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120516

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120516

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-02-09 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20040624

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: JUNGHEINRICH AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20010430

2000-11-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69329156

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-07

2000-08-02 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 625478

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990910

1996-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960920

1996-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HIROOKA, SHIGERU

1996-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KATANAYA, IKUYA

1996-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ORITA, KOJI

1996-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TANAKA, SHINOBU

1996-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-05-22 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 625478

- Country of Ref Document: EP

1996-05-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB