Global Patent Index - EP 0712922 B1

EP 0712922 B1 2000-02-23 - Process for improving lubricating base oil quality

Title (en)

Process for improving lubricating base oil quality

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Qualitätsverbesserung von Basisschmierölen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour améliorer la qualité d'huile lubrifiante de base

Publication

EP 0712922 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95203127 A

Priority

  • EP 95203127 A
  • EP 94402602 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0712922A2] Process for improving the quality of lubricating base oils, which process comprises contacting a lubricating base oil with dry activated carbon.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 25/00; C10G 67/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 25/00 (2006.01); C10G 67/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 67/06 (2013.01); C10G 25/00 (2013.01); C10G 25/003 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

  • J.S. MATTSON, H.B. MARK,JR.: "Activated Carbon", MARCEL DECCKER INC., NEW-YORK, 1971
  • "Fluka guide", FLUKA CHEMIE AG, BUCHS (CH), 1997
  • A. CAPELLE, F. DE VOOYS: "Activated Carbon...a fascinating material", NORIT N.V., AMERSFOORT (NL), 1983

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0712922 A2 19960522; EP 0712922 A3 19961023; EP 0712922 B1 20000223

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091115

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091115

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091115

2010-06-23 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V.

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081022

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081010

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081127

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081127

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080919

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69515158 20000330

2000-03-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981028

1997-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970212

1996-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

1996-05-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL