Global patent index - EP 0712955 B1

EP 0712955 B1 2000-04-19 - Ironing board

Title (en)

Ironing board

Title (de)

Bügelbrett

Title (fr)

Planche à repasser

Publication

EP 0712955 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95116793 A

Priority

  • IT TV940122 A
  • IT TV950050 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0712955A2] Ironing-board, involving a bearing monocoque body (A) obtained in plastic material and provided peripherally with a restraining side able to define internally a first opening (b) extending to the entire working surface beneath it, to accommodate the components, having: a seat of internal suction (3) to said first opening (b) provided with aeration grid (4), said seat of internal suction (3), receiving a suction engine group with respective suction fan; optionally an adjacent container (c) to said first opening, joined monolithically or demountable from same, leaned to an extremity of said working surface with said first opening (b), on the inside of said adjacent container (c) a boiler connected to an iron can be housed; housings, for the relative activation commands of ironing-board and/or the iron, prearranged also to accommodate connection current-taps, said housings being obtained in the part of the body concerning the working surface with said first opening (b) and/or in correspondence to said adjacent container (c); support means fixed in the base and perpendicular to said monocoque body (5), localized for support of a heating working surface together with perimetrical stops (6) on the inside of said first opening (b), for the fixing of the cables; externally, in correspondence to the lower surface of said monocoque body (A), a seat for the anchorage of the static extremity of a compass closable stand leg is obtained at one side, the opposite leg, being engaged to a slide (12) slidably adjustable on guides (11) obtained from the monocoque body itself (A). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 81/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 81/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 81/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0712955 A2 19960522; EP 0712955 A3 19971105; EP 0712955 B1 20000419; DE 69516363 D1 20000525; DE 69516363 T2 20010104

INPADOC legal status

2015-10-25 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69516363

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69516363

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-25

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR

1999-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990407

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR

1997-10-15 [K1C1] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (TITLE PAGE) PUBLISHED

- Ref Legal Event Code: K1C1

- Effective date: 19960522

1996-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961010

1996-05-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR