Global Patent Index - EP 0712979 B1

EP 0712979 B1 2000-02-02 - Method and apparatus to lock and unlock a closing device

Title (en)

Method and apparatus to lock and unlock a closing device

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Ver- und Entriegeln einer Schliessvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Méthode et appareil pour verrouilles et déverrouiller un dispositif de fermeture

Publication

EP 0712979 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95117877 A

Priority

DE 4440740 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0712979A1] The method involves determining an activating code using three locking functions. The second and third functions are additional to the first lock, formed between the housing (2), inner cylinder (3) and a set of rotatable disc retainers (4). Through a long sliding and turning of the key (1), an activation, or more precisely, a deactivation of the locking function and thus of the coded sequence is activated to lock or unlock the locking component. The second locking function is formed between the housing and the inner cylinder, while the third is between the cylinder and the set of retainers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 21/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 21/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 21/066 (2013.01); E05B 21/063 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0622508 A1 19941102 - DOM SICHERHEITSTECHNIK [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0712979 A1 19960522; EP 0712979 B1 20000202; DE 4440740 A1 19960530; FI 111747 B 20030915; FI 955453 A0 19951113; FI 955453 A 19960516

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20151112

2015-12-02 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20151112

2015-11-13 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59507737

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150130

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20141128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000321

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507737 20000309

2000-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

1998-11-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981012

1996-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960731

1996-05-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE