Global patent index - EP 0712997 B1

EP 0712997 B1 2000-04-12 - Suction regulated internal gear pump

Title (en)

Suction regulated internal gear pump

Title (de)

Sauggeregelte Zahnring-/Innenzahnradpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à engrenages internes avec réglage de l'aspiration

Publication

EP 0712997 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95115966 A

Priority

  • DE 4437076 A
  • DE 19523533 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0712997A2] A pump driven by the engine is used for supplying the valve timing and lift adjustment component with work fluid. The pump is formed as a suction-regulated gear ring pump with a sealing plate extending over several delivery cells (17.1-17.3) and has a speed-dependent delivery characteristic line which is matched to the work fluid requirement of the adjustment component. The valve control components are camshafts, the phase position of which is alterable for control of the overlapping times of inlet and exhaust valves. The pump supplies with work fluid an adjustment component for altering a valve lift. The pump also supplies the engine with lubricating oil which also acts as work oil for the hydraulic adjustment component.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 1/16 (2006.01); F01L 1/34 (2006.01); F01L 1/344 (2006.01); F01M 1/02 (2006.01); F02D 13/02 (2006.01); F04C 2/10 (2006.01); F04C 14/12 (2006.01); F04C 14/24 (2006.01); F04C 14/26 (2006.01); F04C 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 14/12 (2013.01); F01L 1/34406 (2013.01); F04C 14/24 (2013.01); F04C 2/102 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0712997 A2 19960522; EP 0712997 A3 19960828; EP 0712997 B1 20000412; BR 9504427 A 19970520; CA 2159672 A1 19960418; CA 2159672 C 20090915; CN 1131731 A 19960925; ES 2146694 T3 20000816; JP 2825782 B2 19981118; JP 3292458 B2 20020617; JP H08210116 A 19960820; JP H10317932 A 19981202; US 5738501 A 19980414; US 5842449 A 19981201

INPADOC legal status

2005-10-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051010

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20031112

2004-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2003-08-15 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2003-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20021010

2002-10-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021011

2002-10-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021011

2002-10-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021010

2002-09-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020925

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011024

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-10-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011011

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-10-01 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011001

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-09-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010914

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2146694

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508170

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-18

2000-05-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 6F 04C 15/04 A

1999-06-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: SUCTION REGULATED INTERNAL GEAR PUMP

1997-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970807

1996-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961010

1996-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1996-05-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE