Global patent index - EP 0713067 B1

EP 0713067 B1 2000-03-15 - Refrigerator with replaceable seal

Title (en)

Refrigerator with replaceable seal

Title (de)

Kühlschrank mit austauschbarer Dichtung

Title (fr)

Réfrigérateur avec joint d'étanchéité interchangeable

Publication

EP 0713067 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95203116 A

Priority

ES 9402965 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0713067A2] The refrigerator door includes a circumscribing seal (9), with an outside portion that may be tube-shaped(5) to house a magnet inside it. The seal (9) has another inside portion or section (4) that carries out the hermetic sealing of the insulating material injected between the door (8) and the inner covering (7) of the refrierator. The outside portion of the seal (9) is separable when it becomes worn, it being replaced by a substitute seal (11) that essentially has the same shape as the removed portion, and includes a means of fastening to the support surface (13) of the inner covering (7), defined by a flat adhesive strip provided with a withdrawable protection film. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 23/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 23/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 23/087 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0713067 A2 19960522; EP 0713067 A3 19970709; EP 0713067 B1 20000315; ES 1029773 U 19950616; ES 1029773 Y 19951201; TR 9501457 A2 19960621

INPADOC legal status

2001-07-04 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20001115

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-08-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BSH FABRICACION, S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2000-08-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-06-16 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000616

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69515598

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-20

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-03-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

1999-07-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: REFRIGERATOR WITH REPLACEABLE SEAL

1998-12-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH FABRICACION, S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-08-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980629

1997-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971022

1997-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1996-05-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE