Global Patent Index - EP 0713069 B1

EP 0713069 B1 2000-04-26 - Process and plant for air separation

Title (en)

Process and plant for air separation

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anlage zur Lufttrennung

Title (fr)

Procédé et installation de séparation d'air

Publication

EP 0713069 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96200235 A

Priority

  • EP 92403330 A
  • FR 9115705 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0547946A1] According to this process: - the intermediate pressure column (2) is operated at a pressure higher than 6 bars and preferably of at least approximately 9 bars absolute; - a first vaporization gas which is less volatile than nitrogen from the top of the intermediate pressure column (2) is condensed in the vessel condenser (8) of the low pressure column (3); and - nitrogen from the top of the intermediate pressure column is condensed and is then conveyed as reflux to the top of the intermediate pressure column, at a level of the low pressure column (3) which is situated above the said vessel condenser (8). Application to twin-column air distillation plants coupled to a gas turbine. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04206 (2013.01); F25J 3/0409 (2013.01); F25J 3/04303 (2013.01); F25J 3/04351 (2013.01); F25J 3/04418 (2013.01); F25J 2200/20 (2013.01); F25J 2200/52 (2013.01); F25J 2200/54 (2013.01); F25J 2200/90 (2013.01); F25J 2210/42 (2013.01); F25J 2215/50 (2013.01); F25J 2250/10 (2013.01); F25J 2250/20 (2013.01); F25J 2250/40 (2013.01); F25J 2250/50 (2013.01); Y10S 62/939 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0024962 A1 19810311 - AIR LIQUIDE [FR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0547946 A1 19930623; EP 0547946 B1 19961009; EP 0547946 B2 20000322; AU 3022192 A 19930624; AU 654601 B2 19941110; BR 9205050 A 19930810; CA 2085561 A1 19930619; CN 1068428 C 20010711; CN 1088301 A 19940622; DE 69214409 D1 19961114; DE 69214409 T2 19970522; DE 69214409 T3 20000713; DE 69230975 D1 20000531; DE 69230975 T2 20001005; EP 0713069 A1 19960522; EP 0713069 B1 20000426; ES 2092661 T3 19961201; ES 2145967 T3 20000716; FR 2685459 A1 19930625; FR 2685459 B1 19940211; US 5392609 A 19950228

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051209

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20021210

2003-10-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-09-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-07-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-07-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. L'*AIR LIQUIDE POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021210

2002-12-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021210

2002-12-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20011219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-12-11 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20011211

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-11-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011126

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-11-20 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20011120

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-11-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011119

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-11-16 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20011116

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-11-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011112

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145967 T3

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000523

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69230975 20000531

2000-05-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-04-26 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 547946

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1998-07-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980525

1997-01-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961122

1996-05-22 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 547946

1996-05-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE