Global Patent Index - EP 0713133 B1

EP 0713133 B1 2001-05-16 - Receiving element for use in thermal transfer printing

Title (en)

Receiving element for use in thermal transfer printing

Title (de)

Empfangselement für die thermische Farbstoffübertragung

Title (fr)

Elément récepteur pour la transfert thermique

Publication

EP 0713133 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95202724 A

Priority

  • EP 95202724 A
  • EP 94202981 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0713133A1] Receiving element for use according to transfer printing, comprising on a support a receiving layer comprising a silver source, capable of being reduced by means of heat in the presence of a reducing agent, a binder and a stabiliser selected from the group of benzotriazoles, heterocyclic mercaptanes, sulphinic acids, 1,3,4-triazo-indolizines, 1,3-dinitroaryl compounds, 1,2,3-triazoles, phthalic acids and phthalic acid derivatives. The receiving element provides images with higher stability at elevated temperatures and upon exposure to light.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/498; B41M 5/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/498 (2006.01); B41M 5/32 (2006.01); G03C 8/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/4989 (2013.01); B41M 5/392 (2013.01); B41M 5/5218 (2013.01); B41M 5/5227 (2013.01); B41M 2205/06 (2013.01); B41M 2205/30 (2013.01); B41M 2205/32 (2013.01); G03C 1/34 (2013.01); G03C 1/49845 (2013.01); G03C 8/4013 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0713133 A1 19960522; EP 0713133 B1 20010516

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041010

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-10-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041010

2003-09-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030902

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-08-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030828

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-08-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030827

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-05-24 [REG FR D6] PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-01 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20020405

2002-02-20 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-08-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69520927 20010621

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2001-05-16 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-16 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010516

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000204

1997-01-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961122

1996-05-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL