Global Patent Index - EP 0713154 B1

EP 0713154 B1 2001-03-07 - Printing device and method

Title (en)

Printing device and method

Title (de)

Druckvorrichtung und Verfahren

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'impression et méthode

Publication

EP 0713154 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95117917 A

Priority

  • US 46720095 A
  • US 34213594 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0713154A2] The printing device has a printing head (14) positioned adjacent a dielectric recording surface (12a), for transfer of variable electrical charges to the latter for recording an electronic image. The printing head has a number of sets of voltage supply points, at least 2 of which are relatively spaced, with individually controlled voltages applied across the supply points, for determining the charges transferred to the dielectric recording medium.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/00; B41J 2/39; G03G 15/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/415 (2006.01); B41J 2/39 (2006.01); G03G 15/32 (2006.01); G03G 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/325 (2013.01); B41J 2/39 (2013.01); G03G 15/321 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0713154 A2 19960522; EP 0713154 A3 19970604; EP 0713154 B1 20010307; AT 199598 T 20010315; CN 1129174 A 19960821; DE 59509075 D1 20010412; JP H08241013 A 19960917; US 5821973 A 19981013

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2004-11-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041124

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-07-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031114

2003-11-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031114

2003-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030601

2003-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030601

2002-10-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021021

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-02-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20011127

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-11-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011122

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-11-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011114

2001-06-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-05-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509075 20010412

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2001-03-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-03-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-03-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199598 T 20010315

1999-01-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981210

1997-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1996-05-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951114

1996-05-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL SE