Global Patent Index - EP 0713753 B1

EP 0713753 B1 2000-05-10 - Slicing machine for slicing two or more food loaves

Title (en)

Slicing machine for slicing two or more food loaves

Title (de)

Auschnittschneidevorrichtung zum Schneiden von zwei oder mehreren Fleischstücken

Title (fr)

Machine à trancher des produits alimentaires

Publication

EP 0713753 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95116064 A

Priority

  • US 32075994 A
  • US 32075294 A
  • US 32074994 A
  • US 32075094 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0713753A2] A high speed slicing machine (50) feeds one, two, or more food loaves (91) along parallel loaf paths into a slicing station (66) for slicing by one cyclically driven knife blade; the slices are stacked or shingled in groups (92,93) on a receiving conveyor (64) located below the slicing station (66). Independent loaf feed drives are provided; slices cut from one loaf may be thicker than slices from the other. The machine may combine manual and automated food loaf loading mechanisms that share a central barrier used only during loading. The automated loaf loading mechanism (75) has a sweep to push loaves onto the loaf paths. There are grippers each loaf path; each has a loaf feed drive that impels the gripper toward the slicing station and then moves it back to a home position. Each loaf feed drive also includes two "short" conveyors. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 1/00; B26D 7/01; B26D 7/06; B26D 7/08; B26D 7/28; B26D 7/30; B26D 7/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 3/28 (2006.01); A22C 17/00 (2006.01); B26D 1/00 (2006.01); B26D 1/16 (2006.01); B26D 3/16 (2006.01); B26D 5/00 (2006.01); B26D 7/01 (2006.01); B26D 7/06 (2006.01); B26D 7/12 (2006.01); B26D 7/22 (2006.01); B26D 7/30 (2006.01); B26D 7/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/225 (2013.01); B26D 1/0006 (2013.01); B26D 1/16 (2013.01); B26D 3/161 (2013.01); B26D 5/00 (2013.01); B26D 5/086 (2013.01); B26D 5/34 (2013.01); B26D 7/01 (2013.01); B26D 7/06 (2013.01); B26D 7/0625 (2013.01); B26D 7/0683 (2013.01); B26D 7/12 (2013.01); B26D 7/22 (2013.01); B26D 7/30 (2013.01); B26D 7/32 (2013.01); B26D 5/36 (2013.01); B26D 5/42 (2013.01); B26D 2001/0046 (2013.01); B26D 2001/006 (2013.01); B26D 2007/011 (2013.01); B26D 2210/02 (2013.01); B26D 2210/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0713753 A2 19960529; EP 0713753 A3 19960904; EP 0713753 B1 20000510; EP 0713753 B2 20150617; CA 2154337 A1 19960412; CA 2154337 C 20050705; DE 69516809 D1 20000615; DE 69516809 T2 20001019; JP H08118288 A 19960514

INPADOC legal status


2015-06-17 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20150617

2015-06-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL SE

2015-06-17 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 69516809

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140630

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131011

2014-07-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69516809

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131011

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121025

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121107

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121029

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-11-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: WEBER MASCHINENBAU GMBH BREIDENBACH

- Effective date: 20010208

2011-11-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: CFS BUEHL GMBH

- Effective date: 20010208

2011-06-01 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: WEBER MASCHINENBAU GMBH BREIDENBACH

- Effective date: 20010208

2011-06-01 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: CFS GMBH KEMPTEN

- Effective date: 20010208

2007-08-01 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: WEBER MASCHINENBAU GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20010208

2007-08-01 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: CFS GMBH KEMPTEN

- Effective date: 20010208

2003-01-08 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: WEBER MASCHINENBAU GMBH & CO. KG * 20010208 CSF GM

- Effective date: 20010208

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-09 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: WEBER MASCHINENBAU GMBH & CO. KG * 20010208 CSF GM

- Effective date: 20010208

2001-04-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: WEBER MASCHINENBAU GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20010208

2001-04-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CSF GMBH KEMPTEN

- Effective date: 20010208

2000-10-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-08-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516809 20000615

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL SE

2000-05-10 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

1999-08-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SLICING MACHINE FOR SLICING TWO OR MORE FOOD LOAVES

1999-07-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SLICING MACHINE FOR SLICING TWO OR MORE FOOD LOAVES

1998-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980929

1997-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970303

1996-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL SE

1996-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL SE