Global Patent Index - EP 0713774 A2

EP 0713774 A2 1996-05-29 - Ink jet head for high speed printing and method for it's fabrication

Title (en)

Ink jet head for high speed printing and method for it's fabrication

Title (de)

Tintenstrahldruckkopf für das Hochgeschwindigkeitsdrucken und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Tête d'impression à jet d'encre pour impression à grande vitesse et procédé pour sa fabrication

Publication

EP 0713774 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 95108400 A

Priority

JP 29012394 A

Abstract (en)

The invention provides an ink jet head which exhibits a good response characteristic through heating and fast cooling enough to implement high-speed printing. A nozzle plate (10) having a nozzle orifice (11), and a substrate (7) constitute part of a peripheral wall of an ink chamber (31). A pressure generating member (20) is provided in the ink chamber (31). The pressure generating member (20) has a buckling member (1), a heater layer (3), and a diaphragm (5). The buckling member (1) is formed into a generally plate shape and its peripheral portion is attached to the substrate (7). The buckling member (1) can be switched between a no-displacement state in which it undergoes substantially no thermal stress, and a buckled state in which it is thermally expanded and buckled. The heater layer (3) is provided along a surface of the buckling member (1) on the substrate (7) side. The diaphragm (5) is composed of a generally plate-shaped flexible material and provided along a surface of the buckling member (1) on the nozzle plate (10) side in such a state that at least its peripheral portion (5c) is attached to a peripheral portion (1c) of the buckling member (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/05; B41J 29/16; B41J 29/377

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/045 (2006.01); B41J 2/14 (2006.01); B41J 2/16 (2006.01); B41J 29/377 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/14 (2013.01); B41J 29/377 (2013.01); B41J 2002/14346 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H0230543 A 19900131 - SEIKO EPSON CORP

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0713774 A2 19960529; EP 0713774 A3 19970402; JP H08142323 A 19960604

INPADOC legal status


1998-08-05 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 19980610

1998-06-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980430

1997-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970617

1997-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB