Global Patent Index - EP 0713777 B1

EP 0713777 B1 2000-03-15 - Arrangement of individual ink printing modules for an ink printing head

Title (en)

Arrangement of individual ink printing modules for an ink printing head

Title (de)

Anordnung für einen Tintendruckkopf aus einzelnen Tintendruckmodulen

Title (fr)

Agencement de modules individuels d'impression à encre pour une tête d'impression à encre

Publication

EP 0713777 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95250207 A

Priority

DE 4443254 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4443254C1] The individual modules (1,3,5) form a stack with spacers (2,4). Plate-shaped piezoelectric actuators (11,31,51) with electrodes on both sides are mounted on membrane plates above ink printing chambers and contact conducting paths on them. The identical modules are mutually offset with nozzle rows mutually offset by gaps. The identical, plate-shaped spacers fix the modules with the desired offset as well as separation. Each piezoelectric actuator has active and inactive regions. A common electrode (112,312,512) extends over all inactive regions. Actuator driver circuits (12,32,52) are mounted on the membrane plates and corresp. connected to the conducting tracks (13,33,53). Each module has a plug connector (14,34,54) connected to the corresp. track. The tracks extend from one membrane plate (15,35,55) over at least one lateral module surface to the other membrane plate (17,37,57).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/14; B41J 2/045

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/14233 (2013.01); B41J 2002/14379 (2013.01); B41J 2002/14491 (2013.01); B41J 2202/19 (2013.01); B41J 2202/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 4443254 C1 19951221; EP 0713777 A2 19960529; EP 0713777 A3 19970423; EP 0713777 B1 20000315; US 5850240 A 19981215

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070823

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070823

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2008-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070823

2007-06-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-04-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-08-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060810

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-07-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060726

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-08-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050830

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-08-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050804

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-07-06 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-11-26 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-06-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: DIGITAL GRAPHICS INCORPORATION

- Free text: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT & CO.#TRIFTWEG 21-26#16547 BIRKENWERDER (DE) -TRANSFER TO- DIGITAL GRAPHICS INCORPORATION#517, DEOKE-DON YANGJU-SHI#KYUNGGI-DO, 482-050 (KR)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507996 20000420

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

1998-04-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980220

1997-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970530

1997-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1997-04-16 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B41J 2/14

1996-07-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT & CO.

1996-07-03 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT & CO.

1996-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI