Global patent index - EP 0713923 B1

EP 0713923 B1 2000-06-21 - Iron-nickel alloy with low thermal expansion coefficient

Title (en)

Iron-nickel alloy with low thermal expansion coefficient

Title (de)

Eisen-Nickel Legierung mit niederigem Ausdehnungskoeffizient

Title (fr)

Alliage fer-nickel à faible coefficient de dilatation

Publication

EP 0713923 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95402513 A

Priority

FR 9414011 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0713923A1] A metal alloy comprises (wt.%): 35.5-37 Ni, 0.03-0.15 Si, 0.0001-0.002 Ca, 0.0001-0.002 Mg; up to 0.1 Mn, 0.005 Al, 0.001 S, 0.01 O, 0.005 N, 0.003 P, 0.005 C, 0.0004 B, 0.001 H, 0.1 Cr, 0.1 Cu, 0.1 Mo, 0.1 V, 0.1 Nb and 0.5 Co; and the remainder being Fe. The proportions of S, Mn, Ca and Mg are governed by: S 0.02.Mn+0.8.Ca+0.6.Mg.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/08 (2006.01); C22C 38/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0713923 A1 19960529; EP 0713923 B1 20000621; CN 1044825 C 19990825; CN 1131702 A 19960925; DE 69517575 D1 20000727; DE 69517575 T2 20010308; DK 0713923 T3 20001009; FR 2727131 A1 19960524; FR 2727131 B1 19961213; JP H08209306 A 19960813; KR 100227354 B1 19991101; PL 180440 B1 20010228; PL 311448 A1 19960527; US 2001045246 A1 20011129

INPADOC legal status

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081110

2009-08-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20090601

2009-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090601

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071127

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071108

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071104

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *IMPHY UGINE PRECISION

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20041130

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-11-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061124

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-11-10 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061110

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-07-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-06-27 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2005-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *IMPHY UGINE PRECISION

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041111

2004-11-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041110

2003-12-09 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031209

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-04 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031104

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-03 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031103

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-10-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-06-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-09 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-08-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69517575

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-27

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK IT LU NL SE

2000-02-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IMPHY UGINE PRECISION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-11-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981008

1996-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960610

1996-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK IT LU NL SE