Global Patent Index - EP 0714002 B1

EP 0714002 B1 2001-02-21 - Electric built-in cooking hob

Title (en)

Electric built-in cooking hob

Title (de)

Elektrische Einbaukochmulde

Title (fr)

Plaque de cuisson électrique pour montage encastré

Publication

EP 0714002 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95119268 A

Priority

  • DE 4319170 A
  • EP 94108267 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4319170C1] A control and display unit for a cool top platform having at least one heating zone, in particular for an electric built-in cooking hob, having a control and a display element for adjusting an electronic control unit which generates control signals for controlling power switching elements of a heating element assigned to the heating zone, is to be improved with respect to the cooling conditions by the fact that the cool top platform (4) comprises a raised platform part (9) above a cutout (8) in the cool top platform (4), and that control and display elements (20, 21) are arranged in the region of this raised platform part (9) (Fig. 1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 7/08; F24C 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/08 (2006.01); F24C 15/10 (2006.01); H05B 3/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/108 (2013.01); F24C 7/082 (2013.01); F24C 7/083 (2013.01); F24C 15/101 (2013.01); F24C 15/105 (2013.01); H05B 3/74 (2013.01); H05B 3/746 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH FR GB IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 4319170 C1 19940901; AT 147150 T 19970115; AT 199281 T 20010315; EP 0632231 A1 19950104; EP 0632231 B1 19970102; EP 0714002 A2 19960529; EP 0714002 A3 19961127; EP 0714002 B1 20010221; US 5528015 A 19960618

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080519

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2005-05-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050528

2004-01-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030528

2003-05-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030528

2002-05-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020507

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-02-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BSH VERMOGENSVERWALTUNGS-G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-06-27 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010627

2001-06-27 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010627

2001-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-05-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010528

2001-05-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010528

2001-05-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-05-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2001-03-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2001-03-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010221

2001-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-02-21 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 632231

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH FR GB IT LI LU NL

2001-02-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010221

2001-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199281 T 20010315

2000-10-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH VERMOEGENSVERWALTUNGS-GMBH

1998-08-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980706

1997-02-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961221

1996-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH FR GB IT LI LU NL

1996-08-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROTHENBERGER, GERHARD, DIPL.-ING. (FH)

1996-08-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROTH, JOACHIM

1996-08-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DAMRATH, JOACHIM, DR.-ING.

1996-08-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WOERNER, BRUNO

1996-08-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BASTIAN, HELMUT

1996-08-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VON BLANQUET, GEORG

1996-05-29 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 632231

1996-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH FR GB IT LI LU NL