Global Patent Index - EP 0714010 B1

EP 0714010 B1 2001-01-10 - Regenerative heat exchanger

Title (en)

Regenerative heat exchanger

Title (de)

Regenerativ-Wärmetauscher

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur régénératif

Publication

EP 0714010 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95118109 A

Priority

DE 4442055 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0714010A2] The heat exchanger has fixed or circulating storage masses (3), and at least one turning cleaning device. The free end of the turning arm (14) of this device, which is also a blowing tube, has an offset part with at least two blowing jets (19). It enables a constant consumption of the blowing gas to be maintained over the entire annular cross-section of the storage masses. These two jets are radial to each other when the arm is turned inwards, and tangential to each other when it is turned outwards. The offset (16) runs at an angle (18) to the turning arm fitting the radius of curvature (17) of the external cross-section of the storage masses.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28G 9/00; F28D 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 19/04 (2006.01); F28G 1/16 (2006.01); F28G 9/00 (2006.01); F28G 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28G 9/005 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Prospekt "Regenerativ-Luftvorwärmer", Fa. Apparatebau Rothemühle, Seiten 1 - 32

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0714010 A2 19960529; EP 0714010 A3 19970709; EP 0714010 B1 20010110; CN 1089431 C 20020821; CN 1133968 A 19961023; CZ 286097 B6 20000112; CZ 9503105 A3 19960612; DE 4442055 A1 19960530; JP H08219687 A 19960830; US 5875833 A 19990302

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040602

2002-11-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021111

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-11 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-06-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508955 20010215

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB NL

2001-01-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-10 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010110

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990315

1997-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB NL

1996-05-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951128

1996-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB NL